Gaskin, Anne Marie (CPSO#: 65101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Limestone Medical Clinic
Upper Level
1100 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G8
Phone: (613) 507-8585
Fax: (613) 507-8586
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 18, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Anne Marie Gaskin, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gaskin to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR.  ANNE MARIE GASKIN
                                          ("Dr. Gaskin")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Gaskin, certificate of registration number 65101, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215228 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled drugs including narcotics.

            (4)   I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
                  Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gaskin undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        a program satisfactory to the College in medical record-keeping
                        (the "Professional Education").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake to complete this requirement within six (6)
                  months of the Effective Date.

            (8)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gaskin, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake that as of the Effective Date I will not
                        issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or
                        administer any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");                       
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (8)(c) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (10)  I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (11)  Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake that as of the Effective Date I shall post
                        a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination and
                        consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                        and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."  For
                        further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                  Dr. Gaskin has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the
                  following: 
                  
                  -     Narcotic Drugs
                  -     Narcotic Preparations
                  -     Controlled Drugs
                  -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                  -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                  Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                  Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (11)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) and in each
                        examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a
                        clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (11)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (11)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (17)  I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Gaskin
                        engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in her
                        prescribing of controlled drugs including narcotics. As a result of
                        the investigation: 
                  
                        Dr. Gaskin must complete professional education in medical
                        record-keeping;
                  
                        Dr. Gaskin must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                        prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);    

                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                        Dr. Gaskin must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms
                        and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice
                        Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. Gaskin has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the
                        following: 
                        -     Narcotic Drugs
                        -     Narcotic Preparations
                        -     Controlled Drugs
                        -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Gaskin, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient charts by
                  the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Gaskin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Gaskin, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

            (22)  I, Dr. Gaskin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Anne Marie Gaskin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 18, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Gaskin engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in her prescribing of controlled drugs including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Gaskin must complete professional education in medical record-keeping;

Dr. Gaskin must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Gaskin must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Gaskin has agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)