Gass, Rebekah Jean Ann (CPSO#: 61135)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1997