Gastaldo, Fernando (CPSO#: 88317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC General Hospital Campus
Department of Radiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46521
Fax: (905) 527-5761
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gastaldo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gastaldo ( CPSO# 88317 )

Business Address:
HHSC General Hospital Campus
Department of Radiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Fernando Gastaldo may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr. Gastaldo holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.Gastaldo no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.