Gatchev, Margarita (CPSO#: 66732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 3640
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MARGARITA GATCHEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GATCHEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995