Gateman, Derek Paul (CPSO#: 100625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fisher Family Primary Care Centre
185 Inkerman Street E
Listowel ON  N4W 2P4
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: 519-291-5947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terry Suggitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gateman ( CPSO# 100625)
Dr. R. Warren ( CPSO# 52853 )
Dr. T. Suggitt ( CPSO# 77060 )
Dr. P. Rutherford ( CPSO# 19820 )
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 58128 )
Dr. B. Matthews ( CPSO# 58936 )
Dr. R. Latuskie ( CPSO# 66312 )
Dr. G. Edmonds ( CPSO# 76383 )
Dr. R. Annis ( CPSO# 59933 )
Dr. L. Hayward ( CPSO# 95251 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200


Corporation Name: Gateman and Trojnar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gateman ( CPSO# 100625)
Dr. M. Trojnar ( CPSO# 101258)

Business Address:
Fisher Family Primary Care Centre
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P4
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK PAUL GATEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GATEMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015