Gatfield, Charles Tea (CPSO#: 65075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's Medical Clinic
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: (519) 284-4471
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles T. Gatfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gatfield ( CPSO# 65075 )

Business Address:
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 284-3450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES TEA GATFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GATFIELD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993