Gatrall, James Rolf (CPSO#: 24606)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 12 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 12 Aug 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 2002
Summary:

 On August 12, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Gatrall’s plea of no contest and found 
 him guilty of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient; he failed to maintain 
 the standard of practice of the profession;  he prescribed, dispensed or sold drugs for improper 
 purpose; he falsified a record relating to his practice; committed acts relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and he engaged in conduct unbecoming a 
 physician.

The Committee ordered the following:

THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE DIRECTS the Registrar 
 to revoke Dr. Gatrall’s certificate of registration, such revocation to take effect 
 immediately.

THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Gatrall to attend before this panel to be 
 reprimanded. 

THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE REQUIRES Dr. Gatrall to pay part of the College’s costs to 
 the College, fixed in the amount of $2,500.00 by August 30, 2002.

THE DISCIPLINE COMMITTEE 
 REQUIRES Dr. Gatrall to pay to the College $10,000.00, to be held by the College in trust, to 
 guarantee the payment of any amount the College may pay out in respect of the patient for funding 
 for therapy and counselling pursuant to section 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 2002