Gattas, David John (CPSO#: 75872)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2001 to 03 Feb 2002
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2002 to 04 Feb 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003