Gaucher, Nathalie Anne (CPSO#: 87006)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2007 to 26 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2007