Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gaudet, Michael Edward (CPSO#: 57211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 591-0606
Fax: (613) 591-0612
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL EDWARD GAUDET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUDET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1991