Gaulin, Paul Emile Eugene (CPSO#: 30953)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2000