Gautam, Mamta (CPSO#: 55418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Psychosocial Oncology
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa
Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: (613) 739-5842
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAMTA GAUTAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1989