Gauthier, Alain (CPSO#: 72823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
39 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2J9
Phone: (613) 264-2686
Fax: (613) 264-0454
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Popiel and Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Popiel ( CPSO# 72687 )
Dr. A. Gauthier ( CPSO# 72823 )

Business Address:
39 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2J9
Phone Number: (613) 264-2686

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAIN GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 27 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 26 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2001