Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gauthier, Andre Leo (CPSO#: 28377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McArthur Medical Centre
390 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N6
Phone: (613) 741-1134
Fax: (613) 741-4276
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.L. Gauthier Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015


Corporation Name: Andre L. Gauthier Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gauthier ( CPSO# 28377 )

Business Address:
McArthur Medical Centre
390 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N6
Phone Number: (613) 741-3355

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE LEO GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976