Gauthier, Raymond Joseph Emile (CPSO#: 23469)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Oct 1993