Gauthier, Renee Rose (CPSO#: 101005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Shores Medical Clinic
10 Maplewood Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 5H2
Phone: (705) 478-0968
Fax: (705) 478-7347
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENEE ROSE GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2015