Gauthier, Stephane Michel (CPSO#: 84971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
Northgate Square
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay ON  P1B 2H3
Phone: (705) 476-7737
Fax: (705) 476-7177
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gauthier ( CPSO# 84971 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
Northgate Square
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay ON  P1B 2H3
Phone Number: (705) 476-7737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANE MICHEL GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2011