Gauthier, Todd Marcel (CPSO#: 93265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Deacon Street
2nd Floor, Tower C
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-3422
Fax: (613) 732-7115
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Todd Gauthier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Gauthier ( CPSO# 93265 )

Business Address:
Second Floor, Tower C
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD MARCEL GAUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012