Gay, Brian Cameron (CPSO#: 16889)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Dec 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1958
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1999
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 12 Jan 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jan 2005
Summary:

 On January 12, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Brian Cameron Gay committed 
 professional misconduct in that in engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by member as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:

1.	Dr. Brian Cameron Gay(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of two 
 months commencing on February 1, 2005; 

2.	Dr. Brian Cameron Gay(s certificate of registration 
 will be subject to the indefinite condition of ongoing monitoring at his own expense, by a 
 physician acceptable to the College, who will: 

i)	meet with Dr. Brian Cameron Gay a minimum of 
 once every two months 	to review and discuss his charts for the purpose of ensuring compliance 
 	with this order and his undertaking; and

ii)	will report to the College a minimum of once every 
 three months; 


3.	A College representative, including but not limited to Dr. Brian Cameron Gay(s 
 approved practice monitor, will be entitled to inspect his practice(s), office(s), and patient 
 charts at any time without notice for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing compliance with the 
 terms of this order and of his undertaking with the College;

4.	If the College receives 
 information indicating that Dr. Brian Cameron Gay has breached his undertaking with the College or 
 the terms of this Order, the Registrar will be entitled to immediately suspend his certificate of 
 registration pending an investigation and a report to the Executive Committee; and

5.	Dr. Brian 
 Cameron Gay pay the College $2,500.00 in costs.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 12, 2005