Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gay, Raymond Bruce (CPSO#: 66661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 506
2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 596-5888
Fax: (613) 596-3254
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

211 Lake Ave E,
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613-257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-761-4000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-761-4000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryding & Gay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gay ( CPSO# 66661 )
Dr. S. Ryding ( CPSO# 67739 )

Business Address:
506 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone Number: (613) 596-5888

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (905) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND BRUCE GAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998