Gay, Raymond James (CPSO#: 28708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
1848 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3C7
Phone: 7055224477
Fax: 7056742504
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
Phone: (705) 859-1420
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raymond J. Gay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gay ( CPSO# 28708 )

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND JAMES GAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1976