Gayle, Barrington Augustus (CPSO#: 21499)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Gayle’s professional misconduct and incompetence have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Gayle is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Gayle engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including by: in or around 2015, misrepresenting to the Office of the Public Guardian and Trustee his qualifications, specialization and/or hospital privileges; from about 2007 onwards, representing to the College that he was practising only in psychiatry and/or psychotherapy, despite providing other medical care to patients; and failing to maintain appropriate boundaries with patients in the manner in which he combined psychiatric care and/or psychotherapy with other care.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)