Gayle, Fay Evangeline Hope (CPSO#: 68577)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 4190 Finch Ave E Suite 207 Scarborough, ON M1S 4T7
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017