Gaymes, Amanda Esther Eleanor (CPSO#: 113814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 May 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA ESTHER ELEANOR GAYMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAYMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2018