Gayowski, Timothy John (CPSO#: 54461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Utah
Suite 3B110 South
30 North 1900 East
Salt Lake City UT  84132
United States
Phone: (801) 585-6140

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Utah

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN GAYOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAYOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1990