Gazarian, Madlen (CPSO#: 66237)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996