Gazzaz, Tamadhir Fadel S (CPSO#: 102524)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015