Gazzola, Steve (CPSO#: 65241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1123
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S4
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2480
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1815 Ironstone Manor, Suite 15B
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Canada
Phone: 905-831-1800
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416 284-8131 Ext. 4135
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON  P1H1H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 789-2311 Ext. 2326
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steve Gazzola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gazzola ( CPSO# 65241 )

Business Address:
Eden Diagnostic Inc
102-300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1

Business Address:
105-353 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3

Business Address:
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone Number: (519) 750-7333

Business Address:
Brantford Diagnostic
72 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 5Z8

Business Address:
102-40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5

Business Address:
217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8

Business Address:
103-3101 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 239-3568

Business Address:
103-2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 763-4331

Business Address:
Scarborough Grace
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Thorncliffe Diagnostic Services
Unit B6 - 45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3

Business Address:
Lakeview Diagnostics, EMP Diagnostic
Ultrasound Inc.
516 Lightfoot Place
Pickering ON  L1V 5Z8

Business Address:
Don Valley X-Ray & Ultrasound Services Ltd.
855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1Z1

Business Address:
Cleveland Clinic Canada
Suite 3000 - 181 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3

Business Address:
Don Mills Diagnostic Imaging Inc.
1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2W7

Business Address:
Bio-Test Radiology Services
2006 Robertson Road, Suite 16
Ottawa ON  K2H 1A5

Business Address:
Bio-Test Radiology Services
1929 Russell Road, Suite 102
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3

Business Address:
2352726 Ontario Inc
North York - X-Ray & Nuclear
250 Marlee Avenue
North York ON  M6B 3H7

Business Address:
2389905 Ontario Inc.
Suite 100
1017 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1Z1

Business Address:
2447648 Ontario Inc.
North York - US & XR
2640 Rutherford Road, Suite 102
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3

Business Address:
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-0022

Business Address:
Muskoka Algonguin Healthcare
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Business Address:
Ellesmere X-Ray
LL4 Basement
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 292-1505

Business Address:
Ellesmere X-Ray
315 - 1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 284-1697

Business Address:
Ellesmere X-Ray
650 Kingston Road
Unit 2, Building C
Pickering ON  L1V 3N7
Phone Number: (905) 839-1806

Business Address:
Ellesmere X-Ray
2880 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 284-1697

Business Address:
Ellesmere X-Ray
Suite 107
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 683-8877

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVE GAZZOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAZZOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2009