Gdih, Gdih Abulgasem Mohamed (CPSO#: 82063)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2004 to 10 Jan 2005
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015