Geary, Denis Finbar (CPSO#: 53368)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016