Gebara, Nadine Souad (CPSO#: 88503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
8 McL, Room 431
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 3434
Fax: (416) 603-5315
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GSH Medical Annex
481 Bloor St West
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-0217
Fax: 416-964-1815
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadine Gebara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gebara ( CPSO# 88503 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
8 McL, Room 431
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
38 Major Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 963-9640

Business Address:
Suite 105
901 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 599-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE SOUAD GEBARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEBARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010