Gebhardt, Colin Robert (CPSO#: 87549)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Aug 2008 to 07 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2015