Gebremicael, Eyob Yacob (CPSO#: 87650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Eritrean

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oshawa Medical Centre
1400 Ritson Road North
Oshawa ON  L1G 7W4
Phone: (905) 433-4284
Electoral District: 05

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 26 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Eyob  Yacob  Gebremicael  may  practice  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.