Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gee, Andrew Stuart (CPSO#: 65498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.S. Gee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gee ( CPSO# 65498 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW STUART GEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2002