Gee, Sydney Roberta (CPSO#: 52402)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Oct 1988
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 2017