Geenen, Caroline Louise (CPSO#: 60811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church Street
Suite 206
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-6551
Fax: (905) 472-5490
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geenen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geenen ( CPSO# 60811 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-6551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE LOUISE GEENEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEENEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990