Geerlinks, Ashley Victoria (CPSO#: 100089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 26 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7742
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY VICTORIA GEERLINKS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GEERLINKS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. GEERLINKS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GEERLINKS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GEERLINKS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GEERLINKS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GEERLINKS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 06 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 12 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2016 to 25 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018