Geffen, Allison Sigal (CPSO#: 66435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Names: Geffen-Geist, Allison Sigal (used until: 04 Feb 1999 )     Geffen, Allison Sigal (used until: 22 Nov 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westboro Family Medical Centre
190 Richmond Road (2nd floor)
Ottawa ON  K1Z 6W6
Phone: (613) 719-7837
Fax: (613) 719-7813
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON SIGAL GEFFEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEFFEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995