Gehman, Kenneth Edward (CPSO#: 58407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 345-4337
Fax: (807) 345-4319
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Gehman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gehman ( CPSO# 58407 )

Business Address:
306 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 345-4337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH EDWARD GEHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1989