Geiling, James Arthur (CPSO#: 85296)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 07 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:UNIFORMED SERVICES UNIVERSITY, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008