Gelder, Cameron George (CPSO#: 71503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500-89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-6614
Fax: 9058486360
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameron Gelder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2006

Dr. C. Gelder ( CPSO# 71503 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6614

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. CAMERON GEORGE GELDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002