Geleff, John Stanley (CPSO#: 57325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
38 LAWRENCE AVENUE WEST
Toronto ON  M5M 1A2
Phone: (416) 485 2633
Fax: (416) 485 0002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Geleff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Geleff ( CPSO# 57325 )

Business Address:
38 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1A2
Phone Number: (416) 485-2633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN STANLEY GELEFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELEFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)