Gelinas, Jill Marie Jacqueline (CPSO#: 68757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Cardiac Surgery
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jill Gelinas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gelinas ( CPSO# 68757 )

Business Address:
Department of Cardiac Surgery
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7513

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL MARIE JACQUELINE GELINAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELINAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000