Geller, Carol Anne (CPSO#: 63806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Phone: (613) 233-4697
Fax: (613) 233-4541
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Geller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geller ( CPSO# 63806 )

Business Address:
420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2N6
Phone Number: (613) 233-4697

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ANNE GELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993