Gelman, Tara Deborah (CPSO#: 76466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: Abrahamsohn, Tara Deborah (used until: 06 Nov 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 489-3273
Fax: (416) 489-1510
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gelman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gelman ( CPSO# 73709 )
Dr. T. Gelman ( CPSO# 76466 )

Business Address:
Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone Number: (416) 497-0880

Business Address:
404 - 586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 489-3273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA DEBORAH GELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2005