Gendron, Sandra Ann (CPSO#: 46395)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1998