Genereux, Joseph Maurice Gilles (CPSO#: 53754)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 12 Mar 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Mar 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1987
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 12 Mar 1998

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Mar 1998
Summary:

 In March 1998, Dr. Genereux pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct in that he made 
 improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug as defined under clause 1(1)6 
 of Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991.  

 Dr. Genereux pleased guilty to a 
 charge of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession as defined under paragraph 27.21 of Regulation 448,  paragraph 29.22 of Regulation 548, 
 and clause 1(1)2 of Regulation 856/93.

Dr. Genereux also pleaded guilty to a charge of 
 professional misconduct in that he performed an act or omitted to perform an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional as defined under clause 1(1)33 of 
 Regulation 856/93. 

Further,  Dr. Genereux pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct 
 in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise, as 
 defined under clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to 
 the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.

The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Genereux(s plea 
 of guilty to these allegations and found him guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Genereux(s certificate of registration to practise medicine be revoked 
 forthwith.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 12, 1998


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Mar 1994
Summary:

In February 1994, Dr. Genereux pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined 
in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety 
with a patient.   The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Genereux guilty of 
professional misconduct.   Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty, in 
accordance with a joint submission, as amended: 
 
   1. Dr. Genereux was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
      Register. 
 
   2. Dr. Genereux s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of 24 months, with 15 
      months of that suspension to be themselves suspended if the following conditions were 
      met: 
 
      (a) Dr. Genereux was to continue with and complete to the satisfaction of the Registrar 
          a therapy program with his treating psychiatrist directed toward boundary issues, 
          victim empathy, and sensitization and relapse prevention, with reports to be 
          submitted to the Registrar by the treating psychiatrist semi-annually while therapy 
          was in progress. 
 
      (b) Dr. Genereux was to have present a third party, employed by him or provided by the 
          patient, and acceptable to the patient, whenever a physical examination of a patient 
          was to take place, with such condition to commence immediately and to continue 
          for 15 months following the completion of the nine-month period of suspension. 
          [This condition did not apply to the taking of a history, provision of advice or 
          counselling.] 
 
      (c) Dr. Genereux was to continue in psychotherapy with his present therapist, or an 
          alternate therapist acceptable to the Registrar, until such time as the therapist 
          advised the Registrar, to the satisfaction of the Registrar, that such therapy was no 
          longer necessary, with reports to be given semi-annually providing assurance to the 
          Registrar that Dr. Genereux posed no danger to the public. 
 
      (d) For 15 months following the completion of the nine-month period of suspension, 
          Dr. Genereux was to request all of his patients to complete a patient questionnaire 
          in a form suitable to the Registrar, with such questionnaires to be filed with the 
          Registrar on a regular basis. 
 
      (e) Within thirty days of this Order becoming final, Dr. Genereux was to post security 
          with the College with the form, the amount, the duration, and the terms of such 
          security to be acceptable to the Registrar. 
 
   3. Should a future complaint of sexual impropriety lead to a plea of guilty or a finding of 
      guilt before this Committee, the present Decision and Reasons for Decision were to be 
      available to be introduced at the penalty stage of the Hearing. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 28, 1994