Genest, Jacques Albert Paul Rosario (CPSO#: 54781)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan D. Lavoie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lavoie ( CPSO# 54785 )
Dr. J. Genest ( CPSO# 54781 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Suite 5-28
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
968 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1K 3B3
Phone Number: (613) 789-4385

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017