Genge, Margot Minette (CPSO#: 64255)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 2001