Genge, Stephanie Ina (CPSO#: 62754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Jervis Place
St Johns NL  A1A 3Z2
Phone: (709) 579-0936

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE INA GENGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GENGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1991